IL SR0301 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges an investment of $1 billion by the State for affordable housing to be included in the next capital budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AFFORDABLE HOUSING-INVESTMENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-05-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-05-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis
2019-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2019-04-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-04-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-04SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback