IL SR0738 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares April 2024 as Minority Health Month. Urges all Americans to learn their LDL-C level. Urges the Illinois Department of Health to update the State's cardiovascular plan to accelerate quality improvements and measures to achieve improved health outcomes for CVD patients. Urges the Illinois Department of Health to develop campaigns to increase cholesterol tests during the month of April. Urges providers to treat all CVD patients in accordance with American College of Cardiology treatment guidelines.
Title
MINORITY HEALTH MONTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 22, 2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Be Adopted Public Health; 007-000-000 |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=738&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SR/10300SR0738.htm |