IN HB1003 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Public Law 124
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Public Law 124
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Redistricting plans. Establishes the special interim study committee on redistricting to evaluate the benefits of and the issues that would need to be addressed if a change in the method for establishing districts for the election of members of the general assembly and members of Congress from Indiana were made, including establishment of a redistricting commission.
Title
Redistricting plans. Establishes the special interim study committee on redistricting to evaluate the benefits of and the issues that would need to be addressed if a change in the method for establishing districts for the election of members of the general assembly and members of Congress from Indiana were made, including establishment of a redistricting commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Bosma [R] | Rep. Scott Pelath [D] | Rep. Gerald Torr [R] | Rep. Justin Moed [D] |
Sen. David Long [R] | Sen. Timothy Lanane [D] | Sen. Michael Delph [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | House | Public Law 124 |
2015-05-04 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senator Delph added as cosponsor |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 469: yeas 43, nays 7 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to committee on Elections |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to committee on Rules & Legislative Procedure |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-17 | House | Senator Lanane added as second sponsor |
2015-02-17 | House | Senator Long added as sponsor |
2015-02-17 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 153: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2015-02-16 | House | Representative Moed added as coauthor |
2015-02-16 | House | Representative Torr added as coauthor |
2015-02-12 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-10 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-15 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures |
2015-01-15 | House | Coauthored by Representative Pelath |
2015-01-15 | House | Authored by Representative Bosma |