IN HB1006 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Public Law 179
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Public Law 179
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal justice funding. Establishes the justice reinvestment advisory council (advisory council) to review and evaluate local corrections programs, grant applications, and the processes used to award grants. Requires the department to compile certain information and submit reports to the budget committee and advisory council. Specifies the purposes for which the department may award financial aid. Repeals the county corrections fund that provides funding to each county for operation of the county's jail, jail programs, or other local correctional facilities or community based programs. Requires a probation officer to consult with community corrections concerning programs available to the defendant in preparing
Title
Criminal justice funding. Establishes the justice reinvestment advisory council (advisory council) to review and evaluate local corrections programs, grant applications, and the processes used to award grants. Requires the department to compile certain information and submit reports to the budget committee and advisory council. Specifies the purposes for which the department may award financial aid. Repeals the county corrections fund that provides funding to each county for operation of the county's jail, jail programs, or other local correctional facilities or community based programs. Requires a probation officer to consult with community corrections concerning programs available to the defendant in preparing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | House | Public Law 179 |
2015-05-05 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-29 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 581: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 561: yeas 46, nays 3 |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Advisors appointed: Young R Michael, Taylor, Bray and Houchin |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Steele and Tallian |
2015-04-16 | House | House Advisors appointed: McMillin, Fine and Lawson L |
2015-04-16 | House | House Conferees appointed: Steuerwald and Pierce |
2015-04-15 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2015-04-15 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 438: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Senator Alting added as cosponsor |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-25 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-23 | House | Senator Bray added as third sponsor |
2015-02-23 | House | Senator Young, M. added as second sponsor |
2015-02-23 | House | Senator Steele added as sponsor |
2015-02-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 191: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2015-02-19 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-17 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2015-02-10 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-15 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-15 | House | Coauthored by Representatives McMillin, Pierce, Lawson L |
2015-01-15 | House | Authored by Representative Steuerwald |