IN HB1010 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Public Law 7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Public Law 7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commitment to the DOC for a Level 6 felony. Amends the law limiting the circumstances under which a person convicted of a Level 6 felony can be committed to the department of correction (DOC). Provides that a person convicted of a Level 6 felony can be committed to the DOC if: (1) the commitment is due to the revocation of the person's sentence for violating probation, parole, or community corrections and the revocation of the person's sentence is due to a new criminal offense; or (2) the person is convicted of a Level 6 felony and the sentence for that
Title
Commitment to the DOC for a Level 6 felony. Amends the law limiting the circumstances under which a person convicted of a Level 6 felony can be committed to the department of correction (DOC). Provides that a person convicted of a Level 6 felony can be committed to the DOC if: (1) the commitment is due to the revocation of the person's sentence for violating probation, parole, or community corrections and the revocation of the person's sentence is due to a new criminal offense; or (2) the person is convicted of a Level 6 felony and the sentence for that
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] | Rep. Michael Karickhoff [R] | Rep. Matt Pierce [D] | Rep. Steven Stemler [D] |
Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Public Law 7 |
2017-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-03-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senator Buck added as second sponsor |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 265: yeas 47, nays 3 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-02-20 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-02-14 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Young M |
2017-02-14 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 109: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2017-02-13 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-23 | House | Representatives Karickhoff, Pierce, Stemler added as coauthors |
2017-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2017-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Steuerwald |