IN HB1017 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a county jail or a department of correction facility to return: (1) certain unused medication to the pharmacy that dispensed the medication; and (2) unused medical devices or medical supplies that are used for prescription drug therapy and that meet specified requirements. Allows a pharmacist or pharmacy that enters into an agreement to accept the return of unused medication, unused medical devices, or unused medical supplies to negotiate a fee for processing the return. Allows the use of an electronic prescription for certain controlled substances.
Title
Unused medication.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Public Law 174 | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-29 | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House | |
2011-04-29 | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate | |
2011-04-26 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 654: yeas 70, nays 0 | |
2011-04-18 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2011-04-18 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 364: yeas 49 and nays 0 | |
2011-04-05 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-04 | Senator Breaux added as cosponsor | |
2011-04-04 | Senator Lawson added as second sponsor | |
2011-03-31 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-02-17 | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services | |
2011-01-31 | Senate sponsor: Senator Miller | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-01-31 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 44: yeas 99, nays 0 | |
2011-01-25 | Amendment 2 (Davisson), prevailed; voice vote | |
2011-01-25 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-01-20 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-11 | Representatives Welch, C. Brown and T. Brown added as coauthors | |
2011-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health | |
2011-01-05 | Authored by Representative Burton |