IN HB1049 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a person may participate in a problem solving court program as a condition of an informal adjustment program in a child in need of services proceeding. Eliminates an individual's agreement to the conditions of participation in the program if the case for which the individual is referred to the problem solving court involves a nonsuspendible sentence as a precondition to the placement of the individual in a problem solving court program. Allows a problem solving court to collect program fees. Authorizes the inspector general to directly institute civil proceedings against persons who have failed to pay civil penalties imposed by the state ethics commission. Requires the state board of accounts to provide to the inspector general (in addition to the attorney general) copies of certain reports concerning: (1) malfeasance, misfeasance, or nonfeasance in office by public officials or employees; (2) fraud or misconduct with respect to public contracts; or (3) unlawful expenditure or diversion of public money. Imposes until July 1, 2017, a pro bono legal services fee of $1 on parties who file certain civil actions, small claims actions, and probate actions. Requires the pro bono legal services fees to be transferred to the Indiana Bar Foundation as the entity designated by the Indiana supreme court to organize and administer the interest on lawyers trust accounts (IOLTA) program. Requires the Indiana Bar Foundation to: (1) deposit in an appropriate account and otherwise manage the fees the foundation receives in the same manner it deposits and manages the net earnings the foundation receives from IOLTA accounts; and (2) use the fees the foundation receives to assist or establish approved pro bono legal services programs. Specifies that the handling and expenditure of the pro bono legal services fees received by the Indiana Bar Foundation are subject to audit by the state board of accounts. Changes the definition of "family or house hold member" to include a person who adopts a child of the other person.
Title
Provides that the cap on the fees for program services provided to a person participating in a court established alcohol and drug services program does not apply to fees for education or treatment and rehabilitation services.
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Koch [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 73 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-14 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-13 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-03-13 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-09 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 355: yeas 46, nays 3 | |
2012-03-09 | Senate Rule 86(a) suspended | |
2012-03-09 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 404: yeas 73, nays 14 | |
2012-03-09 | Rules suspended | |
2012-03-09 | Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House | |
2012-03-05 | Senate advisors appointed: Steele, Randolph and Glick | |
2012-03-05 | Senate conferee appointed: Bray and Lanane | |
2012-03-05 | House advisors appointed: Foley, Leonard and Pryor | |
2012-03-05 | House conferees appointed: Koch and Pierce | |
2012-03-01 | House dissented from Senate amendments | |
2012-02-29 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2012-02-29 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 269: yeas 47, nays 2 | |
2012-02-27 | Amendment 1 (Grooms), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-02-27 | Amendment 2 (Steele), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-02-27 | Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-23 | Third reading: placed back on second reading | |
2012-02-21 | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-20 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-16 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-01-30 | Senate sponsors: Senators Bray, Steele and Lanane | |
2012-01-30 | Referred to the Senate | |
2012-01-30 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 128: yeas 92, nays 3 | |
2012-01-27 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-25 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-01-09 | Authored by Representative Koch |