IN HB1053 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Public Law 97
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Public Law 97
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Drink sales at microbrewery, farm winery, and artisan distillery. Allows any combination of a microbrewery, farm winery, and an artisan distillery that occupy the same building to sell by the glass the microbrewery's beer, the farm winery's wine, and the artisan distillery's liquor from the same service bar, without a structure separating the service of wine, the service of beer, and the service of liquor. Provides that the restrictions and provisions of an artisan distillery's, microbrewery's, or farm winery's permit governing the sale or service of alcoholic beverages apply to the sale and service of the alcoholic beverage.
Title
Drink sales at microbrewery, farm winery, and artisan distillery. Allows any combination of a microbrewery, farm winery, and an artisan distillery that occupy the same building to sell by the glass the microbrewery's beer, the farm winery's wine, and the artisan distillery's liquor from the same service bar, without a structure separating the service of wine, the service of beer, and the service of liquor. Provides that the restrictions and provisions of an artisan distillery's, microbrewery's, or farm winery's permit governing the sale or service of alcoholic beverages apply to the sale and service of the alcoholic beverage.
Sponsors
Rep. David Ober [R] | Rep. Thomas Dermody [R] | Rep. Jim Lucas [R] | Rep. Philip GiaQuinta [D] |
Sen. Susan Glick [R] | Sen. Ronnie Alting [R] | Sen. James Arnold [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Public Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House Committee on Public Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Public Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House Committee on Public Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | House | Public Law 97 |
2015-04-30 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-03-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 298: yeas 45, nays 5 |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senator Alting added as second sponsor |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Arnold added as cosponsor |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to committee on Public Policy |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-01-27 | House | Senator Glick added first sponsor |
2015-01-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 28: yeas 98, nays 0 |
2015-01-26 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-01-22 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-20 | House | Representatives Dermody, Lucas, GiaQuinta added as coauthorss |
2015-01-06 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2015-01-06 | House | Authored by Representative Ober |