IN HB1107 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Public Law 122
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Public Law 122
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Lowers the number of different sections of lots of a land development, from 12 to two, that are required to record certain homeowners association covenants.
Title
Recording of homeowners association covenants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - House - House - Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Civil Law - Roll Call 110702 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House Floor - (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House Committee on Local Government - Roll Call 110701 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Civil Law - Roll Call 110702 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House Floor - (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House Committee on Local Government - Roll Call 110701 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | House | Public Law 122 |
2014-03-25 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-04 | House | Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments: prevailed, Roll Call 391: yeas 87 and nays 1 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 257: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Civil Law |
2014-01-30 | House | Senator Kruse added as second sponsor. |
2014-01-30 | House | Senator Banks added as first sponsor. |
2014-01-30 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-01-30 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 144: yeas 93 and nays 1 |
2014-01-29 | House | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-27 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-09 | House | First Reading: Referred to Local Government |
2014-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Leonard. |