IN HB1137 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Public Law 138
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Public Law 138
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Release for religious instruction. Requires a principal to allow a student to attend religious instruction conducted by certain entities following the principal's receipt of written notice from the student's parent.
Title
Release for religious instruction.
Sponsors
Rep. Kendell Culp [R] | Rep. Jake Teshka [R] | Rep. Ethan Manning [R] | Rep. Timothy Wesco [R] |
Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Sen. Tyler Johnson [R] | Sen. John Crane [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 69 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #2 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 12 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 69 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #2 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 12 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | Public Law 138 |
2024-03-13 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2024-03-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 314: yeas 32, nays 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 319: yeas 69, nays 25 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senator Doriot added as conferee |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. removed as conferee |
2024-03-06 | House | Representative Behning added as conferee |
2024-03-06 | House | Representative DeLaney removed as conferee |
2024-03-06 | House | Representative Behning removed as advisor |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Yoder, Donato and Johnson T |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Raatz and Ford J.D. |
2024-02-29 | House | House advisors appointed: Behning, Jordan and Smith V |
2024-02-29 | House | House conferees appointed: Culp and DeLaney |
2024-02-29 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2024-02-28 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senator Buck added as cosponsor |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 208: yeas 34, nays 14 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 180: yeas 12, nays 37 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Donato) prevailed; voice vote |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senator Crane added as cosponsor |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2024-02-12 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2024-01-30 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 83: yeas 92, nays 4 |
2024-01-30 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Raatz and Johnson T |
2024-01-29 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-01-29 | House | Amendment #1 (DeLaney) failed; voice vote |
2024-01-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2024-01-16 | House | Representative Wesco added as coauthor |
2024-01-11 | House | Representative Manning added as coauthor |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2024-01-08 | House | Authored by Representative Culp |
2024-01-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative Teshka |