IN HB1207 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 114
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Pharmacy matters. Provides that a state employee plan, a health maintenance organization, an insurer, or a pharmacy benefits manager (health plan provider) may not require a pharmacy or pharmacist to collect a higher copayment for a prescription drug from a covered individual than the health plan provider allows the pharmacy or pharmacist to retain. Allows a pharmacist who meets certain requirements to dispense auto-injectable epinephrine by standing order to a person who: (1) has completed a course on auto-injectable epinephrine; and (2) is an individual in a position to assist an individual who is at risk of experiencing anaphylaxis. Allows a person to administer auto-injectable epinephrine to an individual who is experiencing anaphylaxis if certain conditions are met. Requires the state department of health (state department) to issue a statewide standing order authorizing the dispensing of auto-injectable epinephrine. Authorizes the state health commissioner to issue a statewide standing order authorizing the dispensing of auto-injectable epinephrine. Extends certain immunities to the state department, the state health commissioner, and certain designated public health authorities. Requires the state department to approve courses concerning the administration of auto-injectable epinephrine. Requires a person to have successfully completed the course to be immune from civil liability. Adds exceptions to the requirement that controlled substance prescriptions be in an electronic format. Provides that the board of pharmacy, in consultation with the medical licensing board, may adopt emergency rules. Adds advanced practice registered nurses and physician assistants to the list of out-of-state providers whose prescriptions a pharmacist has a duty to honor. Allows a prescription for a patient to be transferred electronically or by facsimile by a pharmacy to another pharmacy if the pharmacies do not share a common data base. Allows a licensed pharmacy technician to transfer the prescription. Allows a pharmacist to substitute a therapeutic alternative for epinephrine products for a patient and to prescribe sterile water for injection with a prescription drug. Allows a pharmacy technician to administer an influenza immunization to an individual under a drug order or prescription, subject to rules adopted by the board of pharmacy. Provides that aggregated information compiled from annual reports of pharmacy benefit managers to the insurance commissioner is not confidential except for information that would reveal a specific pharmacy benefit manager's proprietary information. Requires: (1) a state employee health plan; and (2) an insurer-provided health plan that complies with the federal Affordable Care Act; to establish a procedure under which the amount paid by a covered individual for a covered prescription drug purchased outside of the health plan will offset the covered individual's deductible. Requires an insurer, when removing a prescription drug from the insurer's formulary or changing the cost sharing requirements applying to the prescription drug, to give an insured for whom the drug has been prescribed 60 days notice of the insurer's action and provide an appeal process through which the insured may request an extension of coverage for the drug through the end of the insured's plan year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacy matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #2 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 13 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 10 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 114
2020-03-18HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-16HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-11SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 399: yeas 47, nays 2
2020-03-11HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 398: yeas 91, nays 0
2020-03-11SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2020-03-11HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2020-03-11HouseRepresentative Clere added as conferee
2020-03-11HouseRepresentative Davisson removed as conferee
2020-03-05SenateSenate advisors appointed: Ruckelshaus, Breaux, Grooms and Zay
2020-03-05SenateSenate conferees appointed: Bohacek and Mrvan
2020-03-04HouseHouse advisors appointed: Barrett, Lehman, Fleming and Shackleford
2020-03-04HouseHouse conferees appointed: Davisson and Hatfield
2020-03-04HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2020-03-04HouseMotion to dissent filed
2020-03-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-03-03SenateSenator Leising added as cosponsor
2020-03-03SenateSenator Buck added as cosponsor
2020-03-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 298: yeas 49, nays 1
2020-03-02SenateAmendment #2 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 265: yeas 13, nays 36
2020-03-02SenateAmendment #1 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 264: yeas 10, nays 38
2020-03-02SenateAmendment #3 (Bohacek) prevailed; voice vote
2020-03-02SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-02-27SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-20SenateSenator Bohacek added as cosponsor
2020-02-13SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2020-01-29HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-28HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Grooms, Ruckelshaus, Rogers
2020-01-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 94: yeas 98, nays 0
2020-01-27HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-23HouseRepresentative Barrett added as coauthor
2020-01-23HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-16HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2020-01-16HouseAuthored by Representative Davisson

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1207/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/4/9/e/049e2c44/HB1207.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/5/b/8/05b8b1cd/HB1207.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/0/e/0/b0e010eb/HB1207.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/f/c/88fc42fe/HB1207.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/3/6/e/536e63f6/HB1207.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/e/e/b/0eebcc14/HB1207.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/8/0/0/d8000785/HB1207.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/9/a/7/69a762c0/HB1207.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/1/e/8/01e84f1c/HB1207.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/1/3/a/813a964c/HB1207.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/6/c/7/46c791a7/HB1207.94_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/e/7/27e79df9/HB1207.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/a/d/1/8ad1fdfa/HB1207.264_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/d/a/02dabc88/HB1207.265_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/0/5/5405f8b8/HB1207.298_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/f/5/4/2f54c2d9/HB1207.398_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/2/5/e6250829/HB1207.399_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback