IN HB1208 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Public Law 22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Public Law 22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Additional antlered deer licenses. Allows the department of natural resources to establish a lottery system to allow an individual to purchase a license to take more than one antlered deer within a one year period.
Title
Additional antlered deer licenses. Allows the department of natural resources to establish a lottery system to allow an individual to purchase a license to take more than one antlered deer within a one year period.
Sponsors
Rep. Lloyd Arnold [R] | Rep. Michael Karickhoff [R] | Rep. Steven Stemler [D] | Rep. Timothy Wesco [R] |
Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Brent Steele [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Natural Resources - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - House Committee on Natural Resources - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Natural Resources - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - House Committee on Natural Resources - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | Public Law 22 |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-03-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 288: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senator Steele added as second sponsor |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to committee on Natural Resources |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-02 | House | Senator Messmer added as sponsor |
2015-02-02 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 52: yeas 93, nays 1 |
2015-01-29 | House | Representative Wesco added as coauthor |
2015-01-29 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-01-27 | House | Representative Stemler added as coauthor |
2015-01-27 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-26 | House | Representative Karickhoff added as coauthor |
2015-01-13 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2015-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Arnold L |