IN HB1209 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Public Law 61
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Public Law 61
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Rule against perpetuities. Adds provisions regarding a second power of appointment. Extends the period of time for which certain nonvested property interests are valid from 90 years to 360 years after the interest is created. Extends the period of time for which certain powers of appointment are valid under specified conditions from 90 years to 360 years. Makes conforming changes.
Title
Rule against perpetuities.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Heine [R] | Rep. Craig Snow [R] | Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] | Rep. John Prescott [R] |
Sen. Elizabeth Brown [R] | Sen. Tyler Johnson [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | House | Public Law 61 |
2024-03-11 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2024-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 211: yeas 31, nays 17 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2024-02-12 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-02-02 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2024-02-01 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 123: yeas 85, nays 8 |
2024-02-01 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Brown L and Johnson T |
2024-01-31 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-01-30 | House | Representative Prescott added as coauthor |
2024-01-29 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2024-01-16 | House | Representative Steuerwald added as coauthor |
2024-01-09 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-01-09 | House | Authored by Representative Heine |
2024-01-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative Snow |