IN HB1214 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Public Law 204
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Construction managers as constructors. Repeals a provision in the construction manager as constructor statute that establishes a time period for public agencies (other than state educational institutions) to use the construction manager as constructor statute. Provides that for purposes of the construction manager as constructor statute, the term "public agency" includes a public library and the health and hospital corporation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Construction managers as constructors. Repeals a provision in the construction manager as constructor statute that establishes a time period for public agencies (other than state educational institutions) to use the construction manager as constructor statute. Provides that for purposes of the construction manager as constructor statute, the term "public agency" includes a public library and the health and hospital corporation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-15 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - Third reading (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02HousePublic Law 204
2019-05-02HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-18SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-18HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-15HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 528: yeas 84, nays 8
2019-04-15HouseMotion to concur filed
2019-04-10SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-09SenateSenator Spartz removed as third sponsor
2019-04-09SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 425: yeas 43, nays 5
2019-04-04SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-04-01SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2019-02-22HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-21HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Ruckelshaus, Koch and Spartz
2019-02-21HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 254: yeas 65, nays 32
2019-02-20HouseAmendment #2 (Pierce) failed; voice vote
2019-02-20HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-19HousePlaced back on second reading
2019-02-19HouseRepresentative Ellington added as coauthor
2019-02-18HouseAmendment #1 (Kirchhofer) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-18HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-02-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2019-01-10HouseAuthored by Representative Torr

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1214/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/c/7/1/5c719960/HB1214.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/f/d/d/2fddb7ec/HB1214.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/8/a/6f8abc13/HB1214.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/3/4/6/f346f634/HB1214.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/8/2/ad82eece/HB1214.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/d/d/8/2dd8b135/HB1214.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/6/5/4/d6543604/HB1214.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/1/b/f/d1bf010c/HB1214.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/5/c/b/f5cbec58/HB1214.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/3/6/b63620d5/HB1214.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/0/a/5/90a56aee/HB1214.254.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/b/b/6bbb87d7/HB1214.03.ENGH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/7/f/d/97fd36fa/HB1214.425.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/c/8/2/6c829511/HB1214.528.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback