IN HB1229 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-24 - Senator Head added second sponsor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-24 - Senator Head added second sponsor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the consolidation of a township fire department or fire protection territory in Marion County into the fire department of the consolidated city if the following occur: (1) The mayor of the consolidated city adopts a resolution approving the consolidation. (2) The city-county council adopts an ordinance approving the consolidation. (3) The mayor of the consolidated city approves the ordinance of the city-county council. Provides that a consolidation is effective on the date set forth in the ordinance adopted by the city-county council. Provides for the transfer of cumulative building and equipment fund balances, debt service balances, and firefighting fund balances on the effective date of the consolidation. Specifies that to become a firefighter with the fire department of the consolidated city as part of a consolidation, an individual must pass the work performance evaluation administered by the fire department of the consolidated city. Provides that a physician selected by the fire department of the consolidated city may, upon application by the firefighter, grant the firefighter an extension, for medical reasons, of the date by which the firefighter must pass the work performance evaluation. Provides that for purposes of determining the seniority of a merit firefighter who becomes employed by the fire department of the consolidated city through a consolidation: (1) the time served by the individual as a merit firefighter with the consolidated fire department also includes the total time served by the individual as a merit firefighter with the fire department in which the individual was serving at the time of the consolidation; and (2) the hire date of the individual is the date the individual was hired as a merit firefighter by the fire department in
Title
Marion County fire consolidation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 70 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform - Roll Call 122901 (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform - Roll Call 122901 (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senator Head added second sponsor. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Local Government |
2014-02-03 | House | Senator Merritt added as sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-02-03 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 192: yeas 70 and nays 24 |
2014-01-30 | House | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-30 | House | HB 1229 Amendment #1 (Moed) motion withdrawn. |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-16 | House | Representative Forestal added as coauthor. |
2014-01-15 | House | Representative Torr added as coauthor. |
2014-01-14 | House | First Reading: Referred to Government and Regulatory Reform |
2014-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Kirchhofer. |