IN HB1242 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Public Law 149
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Public Law 149
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Excess liability trust fund. Allows the department of environmental management (IDEM) to pay an excess liability trust fund claim to replace an underground petroleum storage tank being decommissioned and replaced with an underground or aboveground petroleum storage tank. Provides that remaining funds that have not been allocated at the end of the fiscal year shall roll over to the next year and be used to decommission and replace underground petroleum storage tanks.
Title
Excess liability trust fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Morrison [R] | Sen. Greg Goode [R] | Sen. David Niezgodski [D] | Sen. Shelli Yoder [D] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | Public Law 149 |
2024-03-13 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2024-03-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2024-03-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 301: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2024-03-06 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 282: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senators Niezgodski and Yoder added as cosponsors |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2024-01-23 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Goode |
2024-01-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 38: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2024-01-22 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2024-01-22 | House | Amendment #1 (Morrison) prevailed; voice vote |
2024-01-18 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2024-01-09 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2024-01-09 | House | Authored by Representative Morrison |