IN HB1269 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Public Law 185
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Public Law 185
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health matters. Makes the department of correction (DOC) an inmate's authorized representative for applying for Medicaid for inmates who are potentially eligible for Medicaid and who incur medical care expenses that are not otherwise reimbursable. Requires the DOC and the office of the secretary of family and social services to enter into an agreement in which the DOC pays the state share of the Medicaid costs incurred for the inmate. Makes the sheriff the individual's authorized representative for applying for Medicaid for individuals subject to lawful detention who are potentially eligible for Medicaid. Requires a county executive to enter into
Title
Health matters. Makes the department of correction (DOC) an inmate's authorized representative for applying for Medicaid for inmates who are potentially eligible for Medicaid and who incur medical care expenses that are not otherwise reimbursable. Requires the DOC and the office of the secretary of family and social services to enter into an agreement in which the DOC pays the state share of the Medicaid costs incurred for the inmate. Makes the sheriff the individual's authorized representative for applying for Medicaid for individuals subject to lawful detention who are potentially eligible for Medicaid. Requires a county executive to enter into
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Committee on Public Health - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Committee on Public Health - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | House | Public Law 185 |
2015-05-05 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 554: yeas 36, nays 13 |
2015-04-29 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 578: yeas 85, nays 7 |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Advisors appointed: Crider, Breaux and Alting |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Miller Patricia and Stoops |
2015-04-20 | House | House Advisors appointed: Steuerwald, Slager, Pierce and Shackleford |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees appointed: Clere and Brown C |
2015-04-16 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2015-04-16 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 453: yeas 39, nays 11 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Miller Patricia) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Senator Alting added as cosponsor |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senator Becker added as cosponsor |
2015-03-02 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to committee on Health & Provider Services |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-24 | House | Senator Stoops added as cosponsor |
2015-02-24 | House | Senator Young, M. added as third sponsor |
2015-02-24 | House | Senator Crider added as second sponsor |
2015-02-24 | House | Senator Miller, Pat added as sponsor |
2015-02-24 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 240: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2015-02-23 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-19 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-13 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Steuerwald, Brown C, Pierce |
2015-01-13 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2015-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Clere |