IN HB1273 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Enrolled on April 10 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-15 - Senate Advisors appointed: Merritt, Taylor, Ford and Hershman
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 10 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-15 - Senate Advisors appointed: Merritt, Taylor, Ford and Hershman
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Financing of improvements for Carroll Stadium. Provides that Indiana University may issue and sell bonds to acquire, erect, construct, reconstruct, improve, rehabilitate, remodel, repair, complete, extend, or enlarge capital improvements at the Michael A. Carroll Track and Soccer Stadium (stadium). Specifies that the principal costs of the bonds issued (excluding amounts necessary to provide money for debt service reserves, credit enhancement, or other costs incidental to the issuance of the bonds) may not exceed $20,000,000. Provides that the bonds may not be issued unless: (1) the bond issuance has been reviewed by the budget committee; (2) the director of the
Title
Financing of improvements for Carroll Stadium. Provides that Indiana University may issue and sell bonds to acquire, erect, construct, reconstruct, improve, rehabilitate, remodel, repair, complete, extend, or enlarge capital improvements at the Michael A. Carroll Track and Soccer Stadium (stadium). Specifies that the principal costs of the bonds issued (excluding amounts necessary to provide money for debt service reserves, credit enhancement, or other costs incidental to the issuance of the bonds) may not exceed $20,000,000. Provides that the bonds may not be issued unless: (1) the bond issuance has been reviewed by the budget committee; (2) the director of the
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Huston [R] | Rep. David Ober [R] | Rep. Cindy Kirchhofer [R] | Rep. Justin Moed [D] |
Sen. Pete Miller [R] | Sen. James Merritt [R] | Sen. Jean Breaux [D] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #3 (Breaux) failed (Y: 13 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 74 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House - Amendment #10 (Pryor) failed (Y: 28 N: 64 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-02-16 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #3 (Breaux) failed (Y: 13 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 74 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House - Amendment #10 (Pryor) failed (Y: 28 N: 64 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-02-16 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate Advisors appointed: Merritt, Taylor, Ford and Hershman |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Miller Pete and Breaux |
2015-04-15 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2015-04-14 | House | House Advisors appointed: Brown T, Ober, Moed, Pryor and DeLaney |
2015-04-14 | House | House Conferees appointed: Huston and Porter |
2015-04-14 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 396: yeas 46, nays 3 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Breaux) failed; Roll Call 370: yeas 13, nays 36 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senator Ford added as cosponsor |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as third sponsor |
2015-03-02 | Senate | First Reading: referred to committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-25 | House | Senator Merritt added as second sponsor |
2015-02-25 | House | Senator Miller, Pete added as sponsor |
2015-02-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 262: yeas 73, nays 22 |
2015-02-24 | House | Amendment #10 (Pryor) failed; Roll Call 229: yeas 28, nays 64 |
2015-02-24 | House | Amendment #6 (DeLaney) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-24 | House | Amendment #9 (Huston) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-24 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-17 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-15 | House | Representatives Ober, Kirchhofer, Moed added as coauthorss |
2015-01-13 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Huston |