IN HB1316 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - SECTION 6 effective 05/10/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - SECTION 6 effective 05/10/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the division of youth services transitional services fund (fund) to provide juvenile transitional services to delinquent offenders. Permits a juvenile court to order a parent to pay the clerk of the court to provide funds to reimburse: (1) the department of correction for the costs incurred by the department of correction for a child who is committed to the department of correction; and (2) a county for the payment of costs or services for the placement of a child in need of services or a delinquent child. Urges the legislative council to assign as study topics during the 2011 legislative interim whether there should be additional oversight of the fund, parental reimbursement, and other legislative recommendations.
Title
Parental reimbursement for juvenile services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-29 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 75 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 68 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 68 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | SECTION 6 effective 05/10/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | SECTIONS 1 through 5 effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Public Law 204 | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-29 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 521: yeas 44, nays 6 | |
2011-04-29 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 718: yeas 75, nays 22 | |
2011-04-29 | Rules suspended | |
2011-04-29 | Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House | |
2011-04-26 | Senator Randolph added as advisor | |
2011-04-25 | Senate advisors appointed: Head and Glick | |
2011-04-25 | Senate conferees appointed: Steele and Arnold | |
2011-04-25 | House advisors appointed: Foley, Noe and Summers | |
2011-04-25 | House conferees appointed: Dermody and L. Lawson | |
2011-04-25 | House dissented from Senate amendments | |
2011-04-21 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2011-04-21 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 435: yeas 43 and nays 6 | |
2011-04-18 | Amendment 1 (Kenley), prevailed; | |
2011-04-18 | Reread second time: amended and ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-14 | Placed back on second reading | |
2011-04-11 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-07 | Senator Head added as third sponsor | |
2011-04-07 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-03-31 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-03-30 | Senate sponsors: Senators Steele and Arnold | |
2011-03-30 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-03-30 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 370: yeas 68, nays 27 | |
2011-03-28 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-17 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-31 | Representative L. Lawson added as coauthor | |
2011-01-13 | First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs | |
2011-01-13 | Authored by Representative Dermody |