IN HB1323 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Public Law 190
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Public Law 190
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medical residency education. Establishes the medical residency education fund for the purpose of expanding medical education in Indiana by funding new residency program slots at licensed hospitals. Specifies uses of money from the medical residency education fund and the graduate medical education fund. Establishes the graduate medical education board (board) in order to: (1) provide funding for residents not funded by the federal Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services; (2) provide technical assistance for entities that wish to establish a residency program; (3) fund infrastructure costs for an expansion of graduate medical education; and (4) provide startup funding for entities
Title
Medical residency education. Establishes the medical residency education fund for the purpose of expanding medical education in Indiana by funding new residency program slots at licensed hospitals. Specifies uses of money from the medical residency education fund and the graduate medical education fund. Establishes the graduate medical education board (board) in order to: (1) provide funding for residents not funded by the federal Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services; (2) provide technical assistance for entities that wish to establish a residency program; (3) fund infrastructure costs for an expansion of graduate medical education; and (4) provide startup funding for entities
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Brown [R] | Rep. Edward Clere [R] | Rep. Gregory Porter [D] | Sen. David Niezgodski [D] |
Sen. Patricia Miller [R] | Sen. Howard Kenley [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | House | Public Law 190 |
2015-05-05 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 550: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2015-04-29 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 575: yeas 94, nays 1 |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Advisors appointed: Kenley, Tallian and Brown L |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Miller Patricia and Stoops |
2015-04-16 | House | House Advisors appointed: Clere, Ubelhor, Brown C and Porter |
2015-04-16 | House | House Conferees appointed: Brown T and Niezgodski |
2015-04-15 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2015-04-15 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 377: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senator Kenley added as second sponsor |
2015-02-25 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-23 | House | Senator Miller, Pat added as sponsor |
2015-02-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 200: yeas 95, nays 1 |
2015-02-19 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-16 | House | Representatives Porter and Niezgodski added as coauthor |
2015-02-16 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-20 | House | Representative Clere added as coauthor |
2015-01-13 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Brown T |