IN HB1325 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies the use tax exemption for certain aircraft when there is an addition to or reconfiguration of the interior of an aircraft. Specifies when delivery occurs. Provides a sales and use tax exemption for transactions involving tangible personal property by a company that is engaged in offering a competitive racing experience in a two-seater Indianapolis 500 style race car during a competitive racing event. Provides an exemption from the state gross retail tax for tangible personal property acquired for the exclusive purpose of complying with the state tobacco tax laws. Provides a sales and use tax exemption for transactions involving tangible personal property related to the repair, maintenance, refurbishment, remodeling, or remanufacturing of an aircraft or an avionics systems of an aircraft with a country of registration that is outside the United States and that either: (1) has a minimum landing weight of at least 5,000 pounds; or (2) is equipped with a turboprop or turbojet power plant. Requires the commission on state tax and financing policy to study issues related to whether the exemption should be made to apply to all aircraft and avionic devices.
Title
Sales and use tax exemptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - House - House - House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 78 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House - Roll Call 102 (Y: 54 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House - Roll Call 102 (Y: 54 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-12 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-10 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-09 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-03-08 | House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 375: yeas 78, nays 12 | |
2012-03-05 | Senate advisors appointed: M. Young, Skinner and Waltz | |
2012-03-05 | Senate conferee appointed: Hershman and Breaux | |
2012-03-05 | House advisors appointed: Turner, McClain and Klinker | |
2012-03-05 | House conferees appointed: Pond and Pelath | |
2012-03-01 | House dissented from Senate amendments | |
2012-02-29 | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-29 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2012-02-29 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 295: yeas 50 and nays 0 | |
2012-02-23 | Amendment 8 (M. Young), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-02-23 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-20 | Senator Breaux added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-14 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy | |
2012-01-31 | Senate sponsors: Senators Hershman and M. Young | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to the Senate | |
2012-01-31 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 183: yeas 89, nays 8 | |
2012-01-30 | Amendment 3 (Pierce), ruled out of order | |
2012-01-30 | Amendment 2 (Pelath), ruled out of order | |
2012-01-30 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-27 | Representative Thompson added as coauthor | |
2012-01-25 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-11 | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2012-01-11 | Coauthored by Representative Behning | |
2012-01-11 | Authored by Representative Pond |