IN HB1397 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Public Law 152
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Public Law 152
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Private toll facilities. Authorizes the operator of a private toll facility to enforce toll violations (violation) through an automated traffic law enforcement system. Provides that the bureau of motor vehicles (BMV) shall withhold the registration of a vehicle that was operated in the commission of a violation if the owner of the vehicle fails to pay applicable fines and charges and authorizes the BMV to impose a fee for reinstating the registration of a vehicle used in the commission of a violation. Provides that the operator of a private toll facility is not required to pay fees for certain BMV
Title
Private toll facilities. Authorizes the operator of a private toll facility to enforce toll violations (violation) through an automated traffic law enforcement system. Provides that the bureau of motor vehicles (BMV) shall withhold the registration of a vehicle that was operated in the commission of a violation if the owner of the vehicle fails to pay applicable fines and charges and authorizes the BMV to impose a fee for reinstating the registration of a vehicle used in the commission of a violation. Provides that the operator of a private toll facility is not required to pay fees for certain BMV
Sponsors
Rep. Edmond Soliday [R] | Rep. Earl Harris [D] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Sen. Earline Rogers [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | House | Public Law 152 |
2015-05-04 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-16 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 487: yeas 86, nays 2 |
2015-04-15 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 381: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-17 | House | Senator Rogers added as third sponsor |
2015-02-17 | House | Senator Randolph added as second sponsor |
2015-02-17 | House | Senator Charbonneau added as sponsor |
2015-02-17 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 169: yeas 93, nays 1 |
2015-02-16 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-12 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-02-09 | House | Representative Harris added as coauthor |
2015-01-14 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2015-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Soliday |