IN HB1399 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
PFAS chemicals. Defines "PFAS chemicals" and requires the environmental rules board to use the definition in certain rules concerning industrial processes and research and development.
Title
PFAS chemicals.
Sponsors
Rep. Shane Lindauer [R] | Rep. Alan Morrison [R] | Rep. Cory Criswell [R] | Rep. Craig Haggard [R] |
Sen. Mark Messmer [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Bauer M) failed (Y: 28 N: 66 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-01-22 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Bauer M) failed (Y: 28 N: 66 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2024-01-23 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Messmer |
2024-01-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 43: yeas 64, nays 30 |
2024-01-23 | House | Representatives Morrison, Criswell C, Haggard C added as coauthors |
2024-01-22 | House | Amendment #1 (Bauer M) failed; Roll Call 16: yeas 28, nays 66 |
2024-01-22 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-01-18 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2024-01-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2024-01-11 | House | Authored by Representative Lindauer |