IN HB1426 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Public Law 91
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Public Law 91
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Long acting reversible contraceptives. Requires a hospital that operates a maternity unit to ensure that a woman who is: (1) giving birth in the hospital; and (2) eligible for or receiving Medicaid assistance; has the option, if not medically contraindicated, of having a long acting reversible subdermal contraceptive implanted after delivery and before the woman is discharged. Allows a hospital to be exempt from the requirement if the hospital has a faith based objection. Requires the office of the secretary of family and social services to reimburse the hospital for the following provided to a Medicaid recipient: (1) A long acting reversible subdermal contraceptive, including the cost of stocking the long acting reversible subdermal contraceptive. (2) Placement of the long acting reversible subdermal contraceptive. Provides that the reimbursement must be separate from, and in addition to, the reimbursement for maternity services for the Medicaid recipient. Sunsets the provisions being added in the bill on June 30, 2025. Requires the office of the secretary of family and social services to develop a billing process that maximizes federal funding for purposes of the long acting reversible contraceptives reimbursement for a Medicaid recipient.
Title
Long acting reversible contraceptives.
Sponsors
Rep. Rita Fleming [D] | Rep. Cindy Ledbetter [R] | Rep. Maureen Bauer [D] | Rep. Joanna King [R] |
Sen. Susan Glick [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Linda Rogers [R] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #2 (Yoder) failed (Y: 11 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #2 (Yoder) failed (Y: 11 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | Public Law 91 |
2024-03-12 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2024-03-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2024-03-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 303: yeas 87, nays 9 |
2024-03-06 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as cosponsor |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 289: yeas 30, nays 18 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as cosponsor |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Yoder) failed; Roll Call 249: yeas 11, nays 38 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senator Becker removed as second sponsor |
2024-02-12 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2024-02-05 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Glick and Becker |
2024-02-05 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 144: yeas 94, nays 4 |
2024-02-01 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2024-02-01 | House | Amendment #2 (King) prevailed; voice vote |
2024-01-30 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2024-01-23 | House | Representative King J added as coauthor |
2024-01-23 | House | Representative Barrett removed as coauthor |
2024-01-16 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2024-01-16 | House | Authored by Representative Fleming |
2024-01-16 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Barrett, Ledbetter, Bauer M |