IN HB1497 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Public Law 195
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Public Law 195
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reemployment services for unemployment recipients. Provides that certain individuals who have been determined by the department of workforce development to need reemployment services may be required to participate in certain additional services provided by the department of workforce development.
Title
Reemployment services for unemployment recipients. Provides that certain individuals who have been determined by the department of workforce development to need reemployment services may be required to participate in certain additional services provided by the department of workforce development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 62 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Pensions & Labor - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 77 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Pensions & Labor - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 77 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | House | Public Law 195 |
2015-05-05 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-16 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 496: yeas 62, nays 24 |
2015-04-15 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Third reading: passed; |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senator Glick added as second sponsor |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Committee on Pensions & Labor |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-02 | House | Senator Boots added as sponsor |
2015-02-02 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 56: yeas 76, nays 18 |
2015-01-29 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-01-27 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-20 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2015-01-20 | House | Authored by Representative Beumer |