IN HB1507 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Public Law 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Public Law 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
School buses. Provides that a special education cooperative or school corporation may enter into an agreement with an agency or organization serving individuals with a developmental disability in which a school bus or special purpose bus used by the special education cooperative or school corporation may be used to transport individuals with a developmental disability. (Current law provides that a special education cooperative or school corporation may enter into an agreement with a state supported agency serving individuals with a developmental disability in which a school bus or special purpose bus may be used to transport individuals with a developmental
Title
School buses. Provides that a special education cooperative or school corporation may enter into an agreement with an agency or organization serving individuals with a developmental disability in which a school bus or special purpose bus used by the special education cooperative or school corporation may be used to transport individuals with a developmental disability. (Current law provides that a special education cooperative or school corporation may enter into an agreement with a state supported agency serving individuals with a developmental disability in which a school bus or special purpose bus may be used to transport individuals with a developmental
Sponsors
Rep. Edmond Soliday [R] | Rep. Jim Pressel [R] | Rep. Earl Harris [D] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] |
Sen. Karen Tallian [D] | Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | House | Public Law 2 |
2017-02-23 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-02-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as cosponsor |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 126: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senators Crider and Kruse added as cosponsors |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-02-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services |
2017-02-01 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-01-31 | House | Representative Harris added as coauthor |
2017-01-31 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Charbonneau and Tallian |
2017-01-31 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 40: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2017-01-30 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-01-18 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2017-01-18 | House | Coauthored by Representative Pressel |
2017-01-18 | House | Authored by Representative Soliday |