IN HB1643 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Representative Goodin removed as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Representative Goodin removed as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms matters. Designates the following as voter registration offices: (1) Each office affiliated with the Indiana state police. (2) Each office affiliated with the sheriff of a county. (3) Each office affiliated with a municipal law enforcement agency. Specifies that each issuance of a hunting, fishing, or trapping license shall be accompanied by a mail in voter registration form. Permits a person who may legally possess a firearm to possess a firearm on school property if the person possesses the firearm: (1) as an employee or volunteer of a house of worship located on the school property; or (2) while attending a worship service or religious ceremony conducted at a house of worship. Increases the duration of a four year handgun license to five years. Provides that an individual may simultaneously hold both a five year license and a lifetime license. Requires a law enforcement officer to whom an application for a handgun license is made to consult available local, state, and federal criminal history data banks, including the National Instant Criminal Background Check System (NICS), when determining whether possession of a firearm by an applicant would be a violation of state or federal law. Modifies the state fees for five year licenses beginning July 1, 2020. Excludes certain nonexclusive uses of school property from the statutory definition of "school property".
Title
Firearms matters. Designates the following as voter registration offices: (1) Each office affiliated with the Indiana state police. (2) Each office affiliated with the sheriff of a county. (3) Each office affiliated with a municipal law enforcement agency. Specifies that each issuance of a hunting, fishing, or trapping license shall be accompanied by a mail in voter registration form. Permits a person who may legally possess a firearm to possess a firearm on school property if the person possesses the firearm: (1) as an employee or volunteer of a house of worship located on the school property; or (2) while attending a worship service or religious ceremony conducted at a house of worship. Increases the duration of a four year handgun license to five years. Provides that an individual may simultaneously hold both a five year license and a lifetime license. Requires a law enforcement officer to whom an application for a handgun license is made to consult available local, state, and federal criminal history data banks, including the National Instant Criminal Background Check System (NICS), when determining whether possession of a firearm by an applicant would be a violation of state or federal law. Modifies the state fees for five year licenses beginning July 1, 2020. Excludes certain nonexclusive uses of school property from the statutory definition of "school property".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | Representative Goodin removed as coauthor |
2019-02-21 | House | Amendment #3 (Forestal) ruled out of order |
2019-02-21 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-20 | House | Representative Goodin added as coauthor |
2019-02-19 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 84 |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-02-12 | House | Representative Speedy added as coauthor |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2019-02-07 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-02-04 | House | Representative Wesco added as coauthor |
2019-01-24 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2019-01-24 | House | Authored by Representative Smaltz |