IN HR0008 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - Representative Clere added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - Representative Clere added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the legislative council to assign the topics of the use of an unlawful electronic communication device while driving and automated traffic control in construction zones to the appropriate committee.
Title
Urging the legislative council to assign the topics of the use of an unlawful electronic communication device while driving and automated traffic control in construction zones to the appropriate committee.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Pressel [R] | Rep. Charles Moseley [D] | Rep. Edmond Soliday [R] | Rep. Donna Schaibley [R] |
Rep. Mara Reardon [D] | Rep. Edward Clere [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House - Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | House | Representative Clere added as coauthor |
2018-02-27 | House | Second reading: adopted Roll Call 259: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2018-02-26 | House | Representative Candelaria Reardon added as coauthor |
2018-02-22 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-19 | House | Representative Schaibley added as coauthor |
2018-01-29 | House | Representative Soliday added as coauthor |
2018-01-25 | House | First reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2018-01-25 | House | Coauthored by Representative Moseley |
2018-01-25 | House | Authored by Representative Pressel |