IN SB0001 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-28 - Public Law 1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Sunday carryout sales. Allows the following to sell alcoholic beverages for carryout on Sunday from noon until 8 p.m.: (1) A package liquor store, grocery store, convenience store, or drug store. (2) A restaurant that satisfies the requirements to sell carryout. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the alcohol code revision commission.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sunday carryout sales. Allows the following to sell alcoholic beverages for carryout on Sunday from noon until 8 p.m.: (1) A package liquor store, grocery store, convenience store, or drug store. (2) A restaurant that satisfies the requirements to sell carryout. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the alcohol code revision commission.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 38 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 82 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-28SenatePublic Law 1
2018-02-28SenateSigned by the Governor
2018-02-27SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-02-26HouseSigned by the Speaker
2018-02-26SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2018-02-22SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 223: yeas 38, nays 10
2018-02-21SenateMotion to concur filed
2018-02-21HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2018-02-20HouseRepresentative Ober added as cosponsor
2018-02-20HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2018-02-20HouseRepresentative Forestal added as cosponsor
2018-02-20HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 187: yeas 83, nays 10
2018-02-19HouseRepresentative GiaQuinta added as cosponsor
2018-02-19HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2018-02-15HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2018-02-06HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2018-01-24SenateReferred to the House
2018-01-22SenateCosponsor: Representative Siegrist
2018-01-22SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Smaltz
2018-01-22SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 42: yeas 39, nays 10
2018-01-18SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2018-01-18SenateAmendment #1 (Tallian) failed; voice vote
2018-01-18SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2018-01-11SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2018-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2018-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Alting

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2018/bills/senate/1/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/e/0/5/6e0571f3/SB0001.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/4/1/0/74102e5d/SB0001.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/d/b/c/9dbc5034/SB0001.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/b/0/dfb0f404/SB0001.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/7/a/cd7af30c/SB0001.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/8/3/6a8362a0/SB0001.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/0/9/d/009d9289/SB0001.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/5/4/d/354d6008/SB0001.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/7/5/b3758910/SB0001.42.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/b/a/d/7badcd1c/SB0001.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/7/2/7/67273523/SB0001.187.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/a/a/9/5aa93795/SB0001.223.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback