IN SB0014 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-19 - Representative Goodin added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-19 - Representative Goodin added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Magistrates. Allows the judges of the Putnam circuit and superior courts to jointly appoint a magistrate to serve the Putnam County courts. Allows the judges of the Jefferson County circuit and superior courts to jointly appoint a magistrate to serve the Jefferson County courts. Allows the judges of the Scott County circuit and superior courts to jointly appoint a magistrate to serve the Scott County courts.
Title
Magistrates. Allows the judges of the Putnam circuit and superior courts to jointly appoint a magistrate to serve the Putnam County courts. Allows the judges of the Jefferson County circuit and superior courts to jointly appoint a magistrate to serve the Jefferson County courts. Allows the judges of the Scott County circuit and superior courts to jointly appoint a magistrate to serve the Scott County courts.
Sponsors
Sen. Rodric Bray [R] | Sen. John Crane [R] | Rep. James Baird [R] | Rep. Terry Goodin [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | House | Representative Goodin added as cosponsor |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2018-02-15 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-02-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senator Crane added as second author |
2018-01-23 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Baird |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 45: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bray |