IN SB0020 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Deer hunting. Authorizes the use of a rifle to hunt deer on privately owned land during: (1) the youth deer season; (2) the firearms season; (3) the special antlerless season where authorized by the department; and (4) the deer reduction season where authorized by the department. Requires the department to adopt rules authorizing the use of a rifle to hunt deer on public property.
Title
Deer hunting. Authorizes the use of a rifle to hunt deer on privately owned land during: (1) the youth deer season; (2) the firearms season; (3) the special antlerless season where authorized by the department; and (4) the deer reduction season where authorized by the department. Requires the department to adopt rules authorizing the use of a rifle to hunt deer on public property.
Sponsors
Sen. James Tomes [R] | Sen. Rodric Bray [R] | Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Greg Taylor [D] |
Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Rep. Jim Lucas [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as coauthor |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senator Taylor G added as coauthor |
2018-01-18 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Lucas |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 22: yeas 47, nays 2 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Senator Messmer added as third author |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Senator Bray added as second author |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Tomes |