IN SB0063 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - Representative Barnes added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - Representative Barnes added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a civil penalty of not more than $1,000 per communication for a person who makes a communication that contains a disclaimer that is difficult to read or whose placement is easily overlooked. Specifies the font size and color contrast for disclaimers required on certain printed communications. Provides that a person whose sole act is, in the normal course of business, participating in the preparation, printing, distribution, or broadcast of the communication containing the disclaimer does not have liability for a disclaimer that violates the statute.
Title
Civil penalties for certain disclaimers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | Representative Barnes added as cosponsor | |
2010-02-02 | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment | |
2010-01-28 | Senator Becker added as coauthor | |
2010-01-28 | Cosponsor: Rep. Richardson | |
2010-01-28 | House sponsor: Rep. Battles | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to the House | |
2010-01-28 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 68: Yeas 48 and Nays 0 | |
2010-01-26 | Senator Sipes added as coauthor | |
2010-01-25 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-21 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-11 | Senator Landske added as second author | |
2010-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections | |
2010-01-05 | Authored by Senator Leising |