IN SB0071 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
St. Joseph circuit court magistrate. Joseph circuit court magistrate. Provides that when the judge of the St. Joseph circuit court or probate court appoints a full-time magistrate, the judge may not consider the political affiliation of a candidate for magistrate. Provides that when the judges of the St. Joseph superior court jointly appoint a full-time magistrate and must consider the political affiliation of the appointee, the selection method concerning the political affiliation of the appointee must take into consideration: (1) the most recent primary election in which the appointee voted was a primary election held by the party with which
Title
St. Joseph circuit court magistrate. Joseph circuit court magistrate. Provides that when the judge of the St. Joseph circuit court or probate court appoints a full-time magistrate, the judge may not consider the political affiliation of a candidate for magistrate. Provides that when the judges of the St. Joseph superior court jointly appoint a full-time magistrate and must consider the political affiliation of the appointee, the selection method concerning the political affiliation of the appointee must take into consideration: (1) the most recent primary election in which the appointee voted was a primary election held by the party with which
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Representative DeVon added as sponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 222: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senator Broden added as coauthor |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senator Mishler added as second author |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senator Zakas added as author |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senator Long removed as author |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-06 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Rules & Legislative Procedure |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Long |