IN SB0080 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Public Law 53
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Public Law 53
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes 17 interim study committees with authority to study legislative topics. Permits the legislative council to establish additional interim study committees. Provides for the appointment of chairs, vice-chairs, legislative members, and lay members of interim study committees. Specifies uniform policies to govern interim study committees. Permits the chair of a standing interim study committee to establish subcommittees. Eliminates various study and advisory committees. Eliminates obsolete provisions governing legislative evaluation and oversight. Reduces the number of members of the advisory council to the office of the utility consumer counselor and the political subdivision risk management commission to reflect the reduction of the number of congressional districts in Indiana from 10 to nine. Makes conforming amendments. Repeals laws that: (1) establish committees eliminated by this act; and (2) require quadrennial fiscal analysis of statutes regarding redevelopment areas and property tax deductions for redevelopment of real property in economic revitalization areas.
Title
Interim study committee structure.
Sponsors
Sen. David Long [R] | Sen. Timothy Lanane [D] | Sen. Brandt Hershman [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Rep. Scott Pelath [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House Floor - (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures - Roll Call 008004 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure - Roll Call 008002 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House Floor - (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures - Roll Call 008004 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure - Roll Call 008002 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | Senate | Public Law 53 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 507: yeas 100 and nays 0 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 442: yeas 47 and nays 1 |
2014-03-10 | House | Representative Dvorak added as advisor |
2014-03-10 | House | Representative Friend added as advisor |
2014-03-10 | House | Representative Richardson added as advisor |
2014-03-10 | House | Representative Harris added as conferee |
2014-03-10 | House | Representative Bosma added as conferee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senator Lanane added as conferee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senator Long added as conferee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2014-02-27 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2014-02-27 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 313: yeas 93 and nays 0 |
2014-02-26 | House | SB 80 Amendment #1 (Bosma), prevailed. |
2014-02-26 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed. |
2014-02-24 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Rules and Legislative Procedures |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Representative Pelath added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Representative Bosma added sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 101: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senator Hershman added as third author. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senator Lanane added as second author. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-01-30 | Senate | SB 80 Amendment #1 (Holdman), prevailed. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: amended, reassigned to Rules and Legislative Procedure |
2014-01-07 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Rules and Legislative Procedure |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Long |