IN SB0135 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - First Reading: Referred to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - First Reading: Referred to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the assessed value cap (from $143,160 to $195,600) that applies to the property tax deduction for a veteran who: (1) has a total disability; or (2) has at least a 10% disability and is at least 62 years of age.
Title
Assessed value cap for veteran's deduction.
Sponsors
Sen. Doug Eckerty [R] | Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Sen. Lindel Hume [D] | Sen. John Broden [D] |
Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. James Tomes [R] | Sen. Michael Delph [R] | Sen. John Waterman [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy - Roll Call 013501 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy - Roll Call 013501 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Ways and Means |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Waterman added as coauthor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Delph added as coauthor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as coauthor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Young R Michael added as coauthor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Representative Burton added as sponsor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 29: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Senator Hume added as coauthor. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Senator Broden added as coauthor. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Eckerty, Holdman |