IN SB0168 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 237
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 237
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Chemical tests for intoxication.
Title
Chemical tests for intoxication.
Sponsors
Sen. James Merritt [R] | Sen. Randall Head [R] | Sen. Patricia Miller [R] | Sen. Karen Tallian [D] |
Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-26 - House - House - Conference committee report 2 : adopted by the House (Y: 86 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 2 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 2 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 237 |
2013-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-26 | House | Conference committee report 2 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 662: yeas 86, nays 13 |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee report 2 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 584: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-04-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee report 1 : withdrawn |
2013-04-09 | House | House advisors appointed: Steuerwald, Harman, Dvorak and Lawson |
2013-04-09 | House | House conferees appointed: McMillin and Pierce |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Merritt, Randolph and Crider |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate conferee appointed: Head and Tallian |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Concurrence withdrawn |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Motion to concur in House amendments filed |
2013-03-19 | House | Representatives Dvorak and Pierce added as cosponsors |
2013-03-19 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2013-03-19 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 290: yeas 89, nays 0 |
2013-03-18 | House | Amendment 1 (Steuerwald), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-03-18 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-03-11 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as coauthor |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Senators Pat Miller and Kruse added as coauthors |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Cosponsor: Rep. Steuerwald |
2013-01-29 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. McMillin |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 38: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Amendment 1 (Head), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as second author |
2013-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Head |