IN SB0179 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-21 - Public Law 135
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Election cybersecurity. Requires counties to enter into an agreement with the secretary of state to use a threat intelligence and enterprise security company designated by the secretary of state for specified security purposes. Provides that this requirement expires January 1, 2023. Requires an employee or agent of a circuit court clerk, a county election board, or a board of registration to meet certain proficiency standards to be qualified to access the statewide voter registration system. Requires applicants for certification of voting systems and electronic poll books to include information regarding: (1) the batteries used in the voting system or electronic poll book, and any peripherals; (2) a planned replacement schedule for the batteries, and (3) plans to test batteries; and (4) plans for emergency replacement of batteries that fail on election day or during the 30 days before election day. Provides that the number of voting systems to be examined in a public test is based on the number of voting system units scheduled by the county election board to be used in the upcoming election. Requires a single list instead of two lists for testing by counties before elections and sets forth selection requirements for testing. Provides that if a county uploads unofficial precinct election results to the statewide voter registration system before certification of the final results, the county must use a universal serial bus (USB) drive that contains anti-malware protection features or other approved data storage transfer methods. Provides that: (1) if a direct record electronic voting system contains a voter verifiable paper audit trail, the precinct election board is not required to print out the paper audit trail in preparing the certificates setting forth the number of votes cast for a candidate or on a public question in the precinct; and (2) the certificates set forth the official votes cast by the voters of the precinct. Provides that after December 31, 2020, an electronic poll book may not display whether a voter's registration record is in active or inactive status. Provides that in a recount or contest proceeding, the information set forth on the voter verifiable paper audit trail may be used as evidence for a recount commission or a court to determine the votes cast for a candidate or on a public question in the precinct. Permits the secretary of state to issue orders (rather than adopting administrative rules) to: (1) designate elections to be subject to a risk-limiting audit or procedure audits conducted after the election; and (2) to administer risk-limiting audits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election cybersecurity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Hamilton) failed (Y: 29 N: 63 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Amendment #3 (Moseley) failed (Y: 28 N: 63 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Moseley) failed (Y: 28 N: 62 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2020-02-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #2 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 10 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-21SenatePublic Law 135
2020-03-21SenateSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-16HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-10SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 349: yeas 50, nays 0
2020-03-04SenateMotion to concur filed
2020-03-03HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2020-03-02HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 260: yeas 90, nays 2
2020-02-27HouseAmendment #1 (Hamilton) failed; Roll Call 225: yeas 29, nays 63
2020-02-27HouseAmendment #3 (Moseley) failed; Roll Call 224: yeas 28, nays 63
2020-02-27HouseAmendment #2 (Moseley) failed; Roll Call 223: yeas 28, nays 62
2020-02-27HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-24HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
2020-02-04SenateReferred to the House
2020-02-03SenateSenator Spartz added as coauthor
2020-02-03SenateSenator Crider added as coauthor
2020-02-03SenateCosponsor: Representative Wesco
2020-02-03SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Sullivan
2020-02-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 117: yeas 46, nays 1
2020-01-30SenateSenator Grooms added as coauthor
2020-01-30SenateSenator Ford Jon added as third author
2020-01-30SenateSenator Crane added as second author
2020-01-30SenateAmendment #3 (Ford J.D.) failed; voice vote
2020-01-30SenateAmendment #2 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 96: yeas 10, nays 40
2020-01-30SenateAmendment #1 (Ford J.D.) failed; voice vote
2020-01-30SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-27SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-06SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Elections
2020-01-06SenateAuthored by Senator Walker

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/senate/179/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/8/b/7/68b75427/SB0179.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/4/9/5149bf56/SB0179.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/2/0/6/c2061b77/SB0179.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/6/6/c/a66ca463/SB0179.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/a/2/dfa2a33a/SB0179.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/f/a/1/8fa1e9e6/SB0179.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/f/2/03f2046a/SB0179.01.INTR.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/f/c/6/9fc6d091/SB0179.96_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/2/e/8/52e8276c/SB0179.117_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/a/a/49aa3be7/SB0179.02.COMS.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/e/5/c/de5c538e/SB0179.223_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/7/0/8/b708da26/SB0179.224_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/2/a/7/f2a71a47/SB0179.225_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/e/e/4/6ee4a7ef/SB0179.260_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/7/b/4/07b45ccd/SB0179.349_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback