IN SB0179 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Home detention. Provides that a court may not order a person convicted of a: (1) Level 1 felony; or (2) crime subject to certain enhancements; to a community corrections program. Allows a court to place a person in a community corrections program as an alternative to commitment to the county jail or department of correction. Repeals a requirement that a court suspend the sentence for a person placed in a community corrections program. Specifies that a person sentenced to work release in a community corrections program receives one day of accrued time for each day the person is confined on work release. (Current law only specifies that a person on home detention earns accrued time.) Provides that the violation of a home detention placement term constitutes the crime of escape under certain circumstances. Makes technical changes.
Title
Home detention.
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. Scott Baldwin [R] | Rep. Jennifer Meltzer [R] |
Rep. Wendy McNamara [R] | Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives McNamara and Steuerwald |
2023-01-26 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Meltzer |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 28: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Senator Baldwin added as third author |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Young M) prevailed; voice vote |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Senator Freeman added as second author |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Koch |