IN SB0188 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-25 - Public Law 201
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-25 - Public Law 201
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Elimination of the consumer fees and settlements fund. Retroactively amends provisions concerning the transfers from the securities rating settlement fund to the consumer fees and settlements fund effective July 1, 2017, to instead make the transfers to the agency settlement fund. Requires the auditor of state to transfer money from the consumer fees and settlements fund to the agency settlement fund. Provides that the funds appropriated to the attorney general from the consumer fees and settlements fund for the state fiscal year beginning July 1, 2017, and the state fiscal year beginning July 1, 2018, shall instead be appropriated from
Title
Elimination of the consumer fees and settlements fund. Retroactively amends provisions concerning the transfers from the securities rating settlement fund to the consumer fees and settlements fund effective July 1, 2017, to instead make the transfers to the agency settlement fund. Requires the auditor of state to transfer money from the consumer fees and settlements fund to the agency settlement fund. Provides that the funds appropriated to the attorney general from the consumer fees and settlements fund for the state fiscal year beginning July 1, 2017, and the state fiscal year beginning July 1, 2018, shall instead be appropriated from
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House - Amendment #1 (DeLaney) prevailed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Floor - (Y: 65 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House - Amendment #1 (DeLaney) prevailed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Floor - (Y: 65 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-25 | Senate | Public Law 201 |
2018-03-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-14 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 409: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 411: yeas 34, nays 13 |
2018-03-14 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2018-03-14 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as conferee |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senator Taylor G removed as conferee |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senator Tallian removed as advisor |
2018-03-12 | House | House advisors appointed: Huston and Porter |
2018-03-12 | House | House conferees appointed: Brown T and DeLaney |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Bray, Tallian and Perfect |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Mishler and Taylor G |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Concurrence withdrawn |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2018-03-02 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2018-03-01 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 278: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2018-02-28 | House | Amendment #2 (Porter) ruled out of order |
2018-02-28 | House | Amendment #4 (Porter) ruled out of order |
2018-02-28 | House | Amendment #1 (DeLaney) prevailed; Roll Call 264: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2018-02-28 | House | Amendment #3 (Brown T) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-02-28 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-02-26 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-02-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Huston |
2018-02-06 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Brown T |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 166: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Senator Bray added as second author |
2018-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Mishler |