IN SB0198 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Representative Young J added as sponsor
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Representative Young J added as sponsor
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Rioting. Grants, until January 1, 2025, the attorney general concurrent jurisdiction with the prosecuting attorney to prosecute an action in which a person is accused of committing a criminal offense while a member of an unlawful assembly. Permits the chief executive officer of a political subdivision to establish a curfew under certain circumstances. Makes refusing to leave a location in violation of a curfew, after having been informed of the curfew and ordered to leave by a law enforcement officer, a Class B misdemeanor. Allows for the civil forfeiture of property that is used by a person to finance a crime committed by a person who is a member of an unlawful assembly. Prohibits a person from being released on bail without a hearing in open court, establishes a rebuttable presumption that money bail shall be required, and requires a court to consider whether bail conditions more stringent than the local guidelines should be imposed. Adds enhanced penalties to the crimes of: (1) rioting; and (2) obstruction of traffic. Allows a conspiracy charge for a misdemeanor committed while a member of an unlawful assembly. Provides that a person may recover actual damages in a civil action against a county, city, or town (unit) for loss of property proximately caused by an unlawful assembly, if the unit recklessly fails to exercise reasonable diligence to prevent or suppress the unlawful assembly.
Title
Rioting.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Ronald Grooms [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] |
Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Jack Sandlin [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. John Crane [R] |
Sen. Erin Houchin [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. James Tomes [R] | Rep. John Young [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | House | Representative Young J added as sponsor |
2021-03-09 | House | Representative Behning removed as sponsor |
2021-03-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as coauthor |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as coauthor |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as coauthor |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senator Crane added as coauthor |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senator Buck added as coauthor |
2021-02-16 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Behning |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 123: yeas 37, nays 8 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senator Sandlin added as coauthor |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senator Messmer added as coauthor |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Tallian) failed; voice vote |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Young M) prevailed; Division of the Senate: yeas 36, nays 8 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senator Freeman added as coauthor |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senator Koch added as third author |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as second author |
2021-01-12 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Authored by Senator Young M |