IN SB0200 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
Pending: House Roads and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
Pending: House Roads and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Driver's license suspensions. Repeals certain driving privilege suspensions when a motor vehicle is used in dealing certain controlled substances.
Title
Driver's license suspensions.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. James Merritt [R] | Sen. Susan Glick [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Rep. Wendy McNamara [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon added as coauthor |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senator Glick added as third author |
2020-01-27 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative McNamara |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 60: yeas 44, nays 6 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as second author |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Young M |