IN SB0259 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
Pending: House Public Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
Pending: House Public Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Carrying of handguns by members and employees of the general assembly. Permits members and certain employees of the general assembly to carry a handgun within the state capitol building and on the property of the state capitol complex if the member or employee: (1) possesses a valid Indiana license to carry a handgun; and (2) is otherwise permitted to possess a handgun.
Title
Carrying of handguns by members and employees of the general assembly. Permits members and certain employees of the general assembly to carry a handgun within the state capitol building and on the property of the state capitol complex if the member or employee: (1) possesses a valid Indiana license to carry a handgun; and (2) is otherwise permitted to possess a handgun.
Sponsors
Sen. James Tomes [R] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. Brent Steele [R] | Sen. Michael Young [R] |
Sen. James Smith [R] | Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Pete Miller [R] | Sen. Brent Waltz [R] |
Sen. James Banks [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Doug Eckerty [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] |
Sen. Elizabeth Brown [R] | Sen. Michael Delph [R] | Sen. Erin Houchin [R] | Rep. Peggy Mayfield [R] |
Rep. Sean Eberhart [R] | Rep. Jim Lucas [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as coauthor |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Senator Delph added as coauthor |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Senator Brown L added as coauthor |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Eberhart and Lucas |
2016-01-26 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Mayfield |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 59: yeas 36, nays 13 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Tallian) failed; voice vote |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as coauthor |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Senators Steele, Young R Michael, Smith J, Messmer, Miller Pete, Waltz, Banks, Buck and Eckerty |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senators Tomes and Ford |