IN SB0271 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to committee on Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to committee on Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
College and career counseling grant. Establishes the college and career readiness certificate grant to assist school school counselors in obtaining a college and career readiness certificate from an approved postsecondary educational institution. Establishes the college and career readiness certificate grant fund. Requires a postsecondary educational institution that accepts applicants to conduct research into the impact of certification on student outcomes. Makes an appropriation.
Title
College and career counseling grant. Establishes the college and career readiness certificate grant to assist school school counselors in obtaining a college and career readiness certificate from an approved postsecondary educational institution. Establishes the college and career readiness certificate grant fund. Requires a postsecondary educational institution that accepts applicants to conduct research into the impact of certification on student outcomes. Makes an appropriation.
Sponsors
Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Pete Miller [R] | Sen. Carlin Yoder [R] | Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] |
Sen. Frank Mrvan [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education & Career Development - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senator Mrvan added as coauthor |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as coauthor |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senator Miller, Pete added as second author |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Senator Yoder added as coauthor |
2015-01-07 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Education & Career Development |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kruse |