IN SB0382 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-03 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-03 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Statewide 911 system. Repeals a provision that: (1) required the budget committee to conduct a review of the statewide 911 system for years 2013 and 2014; and (2) provided for the July 1, 2015, expiration of the statewide 911 fee if the budget committee did not recommend continuation of the fee. Provides that the prohibition on connecting to a 911 network with an automatic alarm, automatic dialer, or other automated alerting device does not apply to a school corporation, charter school, or nonpublic school that receives permission from the statewide 911 board to use the automatic alarm, dialer, or other
Title
Statewide 911 system. Repeals a provision that: (1) required the budget committee to conduct a review of the statewide 911 system for years 2013 and 2014; and (2) provided for the July 1, 2015, expiration of the statewide 911 fee if the budget committee did not recommend continuation of the fee. Provides that the prohibition on connecting to a 911 network with an automatic alarm, automatic dialer, or other automated alerting device does not apply to a school corporation, charter school, or nonpublic school that receives permission from the statewide 911 board to use the automatic alarm, dialer, or other
Sponsors
Sen. Brandt Hershman [R] | Sen. James Merritt [R] | Sen. John Broden [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Sen. James Buck [R] | Rep. Edmond Soliday [R] | Rep. Michael Karickhoff [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Representative Karickhoff added as cosponsor |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Representative Soliday added as sponsor |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 149: yeas 49, nays 1 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as second author |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senator Buck added as coauthor |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Miller Pete) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senator Broden added as coauthor |
2015-01-12 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Authored by Senator Hershman |