IN SB0400 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Defines "all-terrain vehicle" (ATV) and "recreational off-highway vehicle" (ROV). Amends the definition of "off-road vehicle" for purposes of regulation of land recreation to specifically include ATVs and ROVs. Prohibits: (1) a county, city, or town from adopting an ordinance; and (2) the department of natural resources from adopting a rule, regulation, or guideline; that imposes on off-road vehicles a dry weight limitation of less than 2,000 pounds. Cross-references the new ATV definition for purposes of excluding ATVs from requirements concerning the repurchase of farm or industrial machinery. Provides that a governmental entity or an employee acting within the scope of the employee's employment is not liable if a loss results from the operation of an off-road vehicle by a non-governmental employee, or by a governmental employee not acting within the scope of the employment of the employee, on a public highway in a county road system outside the corporate limits of a city or town, unless the loss is the result of an act or omission amounting to gross negligence, willful or wanton misconduct, or intentional misconduct, with certain exceptions. Requires a collector snowmobile to be registered with the department of natural resources in order to be operated on public property. Adds a 3, 4, or 6 wheeled construction related motor vehicle that is: (1) capable of cross-country travel without the benefit of a road and on or immediately over land, water, snow, ice, marsh, swampland, or other natural terrain; and (2) used primarily for construction related purposes; to the definition of "farm wagon" for purposes of the operation of the motor vehicle on highways.
Title
Motor vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Public Law 86 | |
2010-03-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-03-16 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-11 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2010-03-04 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 271: Yeas 50, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-04 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 299: Yeas 90, Nays 4 | |
2010-03-04 | Rules suspended | |
2010-03-04 | Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House | |
2010-03-02 | House advisors appointed: Dembowski, Torr and Davis | |
2010-03-02 | House conferees appointed: Austin and Wolkins | |
2010-03-02 | Senate advisors appointed: Steele, Arnold and Waltz | |
2010-03-02 | Senate conferee appointed: Yoder and Lewis | |
2010-03-02 | Senate dissented from House amendments | |
2010-02-25 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2010-02-25 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 260: Yeas 97, Nays 0 | |
2010-02-22 | Amendment 5 (Dembowski), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-22 | Amendment 3 (Stilwell), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-22 | Amendment 6 (Friend), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-22 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-02-18 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-02-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation | |
2010-02-02 | Cosponsor: Rep. Wolkins | |
2010-02-02 | House sponsor: Rep. Austin | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to the House | |
2010-02-02 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 162: Yeas 50 and Nays 0 | |
2010-02-01 | Senator Steele added as coauthor | |
2010-02-01 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-28 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-26 | Senator Lewis added as second author | |
2010-01-14 | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation & Veterans Affairs | |
2010-01-14 | Authored by Senator Yoder |