IN SB0419 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-03 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
Pending: House Employment, Labor and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-03 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
Pending: House Employment, Labor and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Town marshals. Provides that, after December 31, 2015, a town law enforcement officer who: (1) is not a member of the 1977 police officers' and firefighters' pension and disability fund and does not participate in another pension or retirement plan offered by the town; (2) has successfully completed the minimum basic training requirements for town law enforcement officers; and (3) normally performs service for the town for at least 1,750 hours during a year; becomes a member of the public employees' retirement fund.
Title
Town marshals. Provides that, after December 31, 2015, a town law enforcement officer who: (1) is not a member of the 1977 police officers' and firefighters' pension and disability fund and does not participate in another pension or retirement plan offered by the town; (2) has successfully completed the minimum basic training requirements for town law enforcement officers; and (3) normally performs service for the town for at least 1,750 hours during a year; becomes a member of the public employees' retirement fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Pensions & Labor - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Pensions & Labor - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Representative Brown, T. added as sponsor |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 55: yeas 48, nays 2 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Boots) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-12 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Pensions & Labor |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Authored by Senators Boots and Arnold J |