IN SB0419 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Public Law 172
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Public Law 172
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Professional and occupational licenses. Provides that an agency or political subdivision may require verification of an individual's eligibility for a professional or occupational license, by requiring the individual to verify under penalty of perjury that the individual is: (1) authorized by the federal government to work in the United States; and (2) executing the verification only for the purpose of applying for a professional or occupational license issued by the state agency or political subdivision. Provides that an individual who is authorized by the federal government to work in the United States is eligible for a professional or occupational license
Title
Professional and occupational licenses. Provides that an agency or political subdivision may require verification of an individual's eligibility for a professional or occupational license, by requiring the individual to verify under penalty of perjury that the individual is: (1) authorized by the federal government to work in the United States; and (2) executing the verification only for the purpose of applying for a professional or occupational license issued by the state agency or political subdivision. Provides that an individual who is authorized by the federal government to work in the United States is eligible for a professional or occupational license
Sponsors
Sen. Blake Doriot [R] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] | Rep. Robert Morris [R] | Rep. Jeff Ellington [R] |
Rep. Doug Miller [R] | Rep. Edward Clere [R] | Rep. Robert Cherry [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Public Law 172 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-14 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 404: yeas 85, nays 7 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 405: yeas 39, nays 8 |
2018-03-14 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2018-03-14 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2018-03-12 | House | House advisors appointed: Clere, Mahan and Shackleford |
2018-03-12 | House | House conferees appointed: Morris and Bartlett |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Koch, Randolph Lonnie M and Buck |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Doriot and Lanane |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Concurrence withdrawn |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as coauthor |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senator Koch removed as second author |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2018-03-06 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2018-03-05 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 319: yeas 88, nays 8 |
2018-03-01 | House | Representative Cherry added as cosponsor |
2018-03-01 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2018-03-01 | House | Amendment #1 (Clere) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-03-01 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-02-27 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-02-26 | House | Representative Clere added as cosponsor |
2018-02-22 | House | Representative Miller added as cosponsor |
2018-02-15 | House | Representative Ober removed as cosponsor |
2018-02-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Ober and Ellington |
2018-02-06 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Morris |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 195: yeas 35, nays 12 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senator Koch added as second author |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Doriot |