IN SB0424 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-09 - Representative Macer added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-09 - Representative Macer added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Women veterans' issues. Requires the director of veterans' affairs to designate a coordinator for the Hoosier women veterans program.
Title
Women veterans' issues. Requires the director of veterans' affairs to designate a coordinator for the Hoosier women veterans program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Veterans Affairs & The Military - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Veterans Affairs & The Military - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-09 | House | Representative Macer added as cosponsor |
2015-03-03 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Representative Saunders added as cosponsor |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Senators Crider and Eckerty added as coauthor |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Senator Delph added as coauthor |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Representative Richardson added as sponsor |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 62: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as coauthor |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Senators Charbonneau, Waltz, Tomes added as coauthors |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senator Yoder added as coauthor |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as coauthor |
2015-01-12 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs & The Military |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Rogers |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Authored by Senators Becker, Glick, Leising |