IN SB0450 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Public Law 118
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Public Law 118
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Notice of tax sales. Provides that if properties are not sold at an initial tax sale, the county auditor may publish an abridged tax sale notice for any subsequent tax sales. The abridged tax sale notice may omit the descriptions of specific properties eligible for sale if the abridged notice includes a statement that the descriptions are available on the county's Internet web site and in printed form from the county auditor upon request.
Title
Notice of tax sales. Provides that if properties are not sold at an initial tax sale, the county auditor may publish an abridged tax sale notice for any subsequent tax sales. The abridged tax sale notice may omit the descriptions of specific properties eligible for sale if the abridged notice includes a statement that the descriptions are available on the county's Internet web site and in printed form from the county auditor upon request.
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Niemeyer [R] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. Greg Taylor [D] | Rep. Harold Slager [R] |
Rep. Richard Hamm [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - House - House Floor - (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | Senate | Public Law 118 |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-15 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2015-04-14 | House | Representative Hamm added as cosponsor |
2015-04-14 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 423: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2015-04-13 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-04-09 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-03-05 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senator Ford added as second author |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Representative Slager added as sponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 254: yeas 44, nays 6 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senator Taylor added as coauthor |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-12 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Authored by Senator Niemeyer |