IN SB0467 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-17 - Public Law 33
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-17 - Public Law 33
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Admissibility of appraisal reports. Provides that the Indiana board of tax review shall admit into evidence an appraisal report prepared by an appraiser, unless the appraisal report is ruled inadmissible on grounds other than hearsay.
Title
Admissibility of appraisal reports. Provides that the Indiana board of tax review shall admit into evidence an appraisal report prepared by an appraiser, unless the appraisal report is ruled inadmissible on grounds other than hearsay.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Schneider [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Jean Breaux [D] | Rep. Wes Culver [R] |
Rep. Daniel Leonard [R] | Rep. Holli Sullivan [R] | Rep. Steven Stemler [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-17 | Senate | Public Law 33 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-01 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2015-03-31 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 358: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2015-03-30 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-26 | House | Representatives Leonard, Sullivan, Stemler added as cosponsors |
2015-03-26 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-03-03 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Representative Culver added as sponsor |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 153: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senator Randolph removed as coauthor |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as second author |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as coauthor |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-14 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Schneider |